Ocasio-Rivera v. Doctors Center Hospital Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elvia G. Ocasio-Rivera
Defendant: Doctors Center Hospital Inc., Dr. Orlando G. Gonzalez-Morales, Dr. Santiago Ulloa-Ramirez, John Doe, James Roe, Dr. Melitsa Aguilar-Marrero, A, B, C Insurance Companies, Inc. and D, E, F Insurance Companies
Case Number: 3:2019cv01556
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/11/19 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Elvia G. Ocasio-Rivera filed by Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil on behalf of Dr. Melitsa Aguilar-Marrero Responses due by 7/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Gonzalez-Villamil, Jose)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 9, 2019 to File Answer to the complaint filed by Doris Quinones-Tridas on behalf of Dr. Santiago Ulloa-Ramirez Responses due by 7/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Tridas, Doris)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 31, 2019 to File Answer to complanit filed by Igor Dominguez-Perez on behalf of Dr. Orlando G. Gonzalez-Morales Responses due by 7/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dominguez-Perez, Igor)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elvia G. Ocasio-Rivera upon Dr. Melitsa Aguilar-Marrero served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elvia G. Ocasio-Rivera upon Doctors Center Hospital Inc. served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Dr. Orlando G. Gonzalez-Morales served on 6/14/2019; Dr. Santiago Ulloa-Ramirez served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dr. Melitsa Aguilar-Marrero, Doctors Center Hospital Inc., Dr. Orlando G. Gonzalez-Morales, Dr. Santiago Ulloa-Ramirez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of Elvia G. Ocasio-Rivera (Vicens, Vanesa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of Elvia G. Ocasio-Rivera (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6442450.), filed by Elvia G. Ocasio-Rivera. Service due by 9/4/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Williams-English, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocasio-Rivera v. Doctors Center Hospital Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctors Center Hospital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Orlando G. Gonzalez-Morales
Represented By: Igor Dominguez-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Santiago Ulloa-Ramirez
Represented By: Doris Quinones-Tridas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Melitsa Aguilar-Marrero
Represented By: Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A, B, C Insurance Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D, E, F Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvia G. Ocasio-Rivera
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?