United States of America v. Rivera-Sanabria
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Miguel Rivera-Sanabria
Case Number: 3:2019cv01557
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. §3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT is hereby entered STAYING the proceedings until the criminal proceedings conclude. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/8/2019.(gmm)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #2 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/8/2019. (MET)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit One, #2 Category Sheet Exhibit Two) (Lopez-Rivera, Rafael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay Affirmative Civil Enforcement Pending Resolution of Criminal Case 18-cr-454 (DRD) re: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America filed by Rafael J. Lopez-Rivera on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 6/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Lopez-Rivera, Rafael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Miguel Rivera-Sanabria, filed by United States of America. Service due by 9/5/2019,(Lopez-Rivera, Rafael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rivera-Sanabria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Rivera-Sanabria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rafael J. Lopez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?