Guzman-Font v. USA
Petitioner: Saul Guzman-Font
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01572
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 Motion Requesting Order. The motion will be decided in due course. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/03/2019. (brc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION requesting status filed by Saul Guzman-Font, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ab)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-381) filed by Saul Guzman-Font, Pro Se. Responses due by 6/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Vacate 28 U.S.C. 2255, #2 Affidavit, #3 Envelope)(arg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman-Font v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Saul Guzman-Font
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?