Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Eckardt-Vidal et al
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, D/B/A CHRISTIANA TRUST, AS IDENTURE TRUSTEE, FOR THE CSMC 2015-PR1 TRUST, MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2015-PR1 and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: United States of America, BECKER DE JESUS ECKARDT VIDAL and Becker De Jesus Eckardt-Vidal
Case Number: 3:2019cv01577
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Summons By publication issued as to Becker De Jesus Eckardt-Vidal. (Attachments: #1 Summons By publication) (vdm)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 "Motion Requesting Order for Service by Publication." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/26/2019. (EMJ)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION requesting Order for Service by Publication filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, D/B/A CHRISTIANA TRUST, AS IDENTURE TRUSTEE, FOR THE CSMC 2015-PR1 TRUST, MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2015-PR1 Responses due by 7/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Prop Order, #3 Summons)(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, D/B/A CHRISTIANA TRUST, AS IDENTURE TRUSTEE, FOR THE CSMC 2015-PR1 TRUST, MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2015-PR1 upon United States of America served on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BECKER DE JESUS ECKARDT VIDAL, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Disclosure DISCLOSURE IN COMPLIANCE filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, D/B/A CHRISTIANA TRUST, AS IDENTURE TRUSTEE, FOR THE CSMC 2015-PR1 TRUST, MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2015-PR1 Responses due by 6/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BECKER DE JESUS ECKARDT VIDAL, United States of America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6454227.), filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, D/B/A CHRISTIANA TRUST, AS IDENTURE TRUSTEE, FOR THE CSMC 2015-PR1 TRUST, MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2015-PR1. Service due by 9/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #3 Category Sheet Category sheet, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons)(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Eckardt-Vidal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, D/B/A CHRISTIANA TRUST, AS IDENTURE TRUSTEE, FOR THE CSMC 2015-PR1 TRUST, MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2015-PR1
Represented By: Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECKER DE JESUS ECKARDT VIDAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becker De Jesus Eckardt-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?