Herrera-Cruz v. Dr. Susoni Health Community Service Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Salvador C Herrera Cruz and Mr. Salvador C. Herrera-Cruz
Defendant: RB Fueling Limited Company LLC, Mathew Bargo, John Doe, Richard Roe, Metro Pavia Hospital, Inc., Dr. Susoni Health Community Service Corp., Metro Pavia Healthcare Centers, Inc., XZY Insurance Company, BioMedical Application of Puerto Rico, Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc., Metro Pavia Health System, Inc., Bio-Medical Application of Arecibo, Inc. and Universal Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01582
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Noting #26 "Motion in Compliance." Because the Amended Complaint does not include Metro Pavia Healthcare Centers, Inc. or Metro Pavia Hospital, Inc. as defendants, the request to dismiss at Docket No. 16 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/30/2019. (LMR)
July 27, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salvador C. Herrera-Cruz upon Universal Group, Inc. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Charles-Gomez, Francisco)
July 25, 2019 Filing 26 Motion In Compliance as to 19 Order,, Set Deadlines, 24 Order filed by Francisco L. Charles-Gomez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 19 , 24 ) (Charles-Gomez, Francisco)
July 23, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint, filed by Krystel Saez on behalf of Defendant Metro Pavia Health System, Inc..(Saez, Krystel)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Noting #23 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/23/2019. (ebb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystel Saez on behalf of Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. (Saez, Krystel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 22 ***FILED IN ERROR-DUPLICATE FILING AS OF DOCKET 25*** ANSWER to #1 Complaint, First Amended Complaint filed by Krystel Saez on behalf of Defendant Metro Pavia Health System, Inc..(Saez, Krystel) Modified on 7/24/2019 (mr).
July 23, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #14 Answer to Amended Complaint, #15 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-file.*** (mr)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting #18 "Motion For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead." Doctor Susoni Health Community Services, Corp. shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 8/22/2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/23/2019. (ebb)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Noting #17 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/23/2019. (ebb)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: #16 "Motion to Dismiss" Plaintiff shall respond to this motion by 8/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez(LMR)
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for extension of time until August 22, 2019 filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Dr. Susoni Health Community Service Corp. Responses due by 8/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
July 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Dr. Susoni Health Community Service Corp. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to dismiss as to Metro Pavia Hospital, Inc., Metro Pavia Healthcare Centers, Inc. filed by Metro Pavia Hospital, Inc., Metro Pavia Healthcare Centers, Inc. Responses due by 8/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Capo, Miglisa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 ***FILED IN ERROR-LEGAL FORMAT*** NOTICE of Appearance by Krystel Saez on behalf of Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. (Saez, Krystel) Modified on 7/23/2019 (mr).
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 ***FILED IN ERROR-LEGAL FORMAT*** ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint, filed by Krystel Saez on behalf of Defendant Metro Pavia Health System, Inc..(Saez, Krystel) Modified on 7/23/2019 (mr).
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Universal Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action - Amended Complaint) (rim)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mathew Bargo, Bio-Medical Application of Arecibo, Inc., Dr. Susoni Health Community Service Corp., Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc., John Doe, Metro Pavia Health System, Inc., RB Fueling Limited Company LLC, Richard Roe, XZY Insurance Company, filed by Salvador C Herrera Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons-Universal)(Charles-Gomez, Francisco)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salvador C Herrera Cruz upon Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; Metro Pavia Healthcare Centers, Inc. served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; Metro Pavia Hospital, Inc. served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Charles-Gomez, Francisco)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salvador C Herrera Cruz upon Dr. Susoni Health Community Service Corp. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Charles-Gomez, Francisco) Modified on 7/9/2019 to correct event and remove restriction (mcm).
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. and Metro Pavia Healthcare Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons to be issued for parties in the complaint re #1 Complaint, filed by Salvador C Herrera Cruz (Charles-Gomez, Francisco)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Dr. Susoni Health Community Service Corp., Metro Pavia Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
June 22, 2019 Filing 6 Second NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint, filed by Salvador C Herrera Cruz (Cancio-Valdivia, Jorge)
June 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint, filed by Salvador C Herrera Cruz (Cancio-Valdivia, Jorge)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge L. Cancio-Valdivia on behalf of Salvador C Herrera Cruz (Cancio-Valdivia, Jorge)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mathew Bargo, Bio-Medical Application of Arecibo, Inc., Metro Pavia Hospital, Inc., RB Fueling Limited Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6455361.), filed by Salvador C Herrera Cruz. Service due by 9/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Category Sheet Category, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Charles-Gomez, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera-Cruz v. Dr. Susoni Health Community Service Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RB Fueling Limited Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Bargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Pavia Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Miglisa L. Capo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Susoni Health Community Service Corp.
Represented By: Jose J. Lamas-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Pavia Healthcare Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Miglisa L. Capo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XZY Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioMedical Application of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Pavia Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Krystel Saez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bio-Medical Application of Arecibo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Salvador C Herrera Cruz
Represented By: Francisco L. Charles-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Salvador C. Herrera-Cruz
Represented By: Francisco L. Charles-Gomez
Represented By: Jorge L. Cancio-Valdivia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?