Oquendo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gladys Oquendo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01593
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Marshal D Morgan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granted #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (Docket No. 7), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan for all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 19-1593(MDM). Judge Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 06/19/2019. (gr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Because plaintiff has also consented (Docket No. 5), the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/19/2019.(EMJ)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gladys Oquendo. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Gladys Oquendo (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Gladys Oquendo. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Gladys Oquendo. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Gladys Oquendo Responses due by 7/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oquendo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Oquendo
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?