Union Internacional UAW, Local 2415 v. Bacardi Corporation
Plaintiff: Union Internacional UAW, Local 2415
Defendant: Bacardi Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01597
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion submitting Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/19/2019. (EES)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Union Internacional UAW, Local 2415 (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Submitting certified translations filed by Nicole Marie Rodriguez-Ugarte on behalf of Bacardi Corporation Responses due by 8/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rodriguez-Ugarte, Nicole)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Motion In Compliance with Court Order at Dkt. No. 3 filed by Jose A. Silva-Cofresi on behalf of Bacardi Corporation Responses due by 7/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Category Sheet Category Sheet)(Silva-Cofresi, Jose)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 6/20/2019. (arg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for extension of time until 7/18/2019 to file certified translations filed by Jose A. Silva-Cofresi on behalf of Bacardi Corporation Responses due by 7/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Silva-Cofresi, Jose)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from PR Court of First Instance, San Juan Part, case number SJ2019CV06337. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6459768), filed by Bacardi Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Silva-Cofresi, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Internacional UAW, Local 2415 v. Bacardi Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacardi Corporation
Represented By: Jose A. Silva-Cofresi
Represented By: Nicole Marie Rodriguez-Ugarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Internacional UAW, Local 2415
Represented By: Miguel Simonet-Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?