Luciano-Avellanet v. M/Y Los Porta et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Luciano-Avellanet
Defendant: PELAYOS MARINE, INC., M/Y LOS PORTA, PELAYO GONZALEZ-GOMEZ, Insurance Companies A B C, Jane Doe, John Doe, Corporations X, Y and Z and Pelayo's Marine, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01601
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 Warrant of Arrest of Vessel Issued to arrest property as to M/Y Los Porta. (Attachments: #1 Warrant in Rem) (vdm)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/8/2019. (wm)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/3/2019. (gmm)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ***SELECTED PARTIES***ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/2/2019. (gmm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Pelayo Gonzalez-Gomez, Pelayo's Marine, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 6/21/2019 to remove caps (rom).
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Restrict Document (Ex Parte Motion for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest) filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of Anthony Luciano-Avellanet Responses due by 7/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Custodian filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of Anthony Luciano-Avellanet Responses due by 7/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of Anthony Luciano-Avellanet Responses due by 7/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Castaner-Padro, Alberto) Modified on 6/20/2019 to add restriction as per D.E. #4 (rom).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT In Admiralty against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6460731.), filed by Anthony Luciano-Avellanet. Service due by 9/17/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Castaner-Padro, Alberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luciano-Avellanet v. M/Y Los Porta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PELAYOS MARINE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y LOS PORTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PELAYO GONZALEZ-GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies A B C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporations X, Y and Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelayo's Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Luciano-Avellanet
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?