Abbey Cayman Asset Company v. The Estate of Nitza Milagros Marrero Robles et al
Plaintiff: Abbey Cayman Asset Company
Defendant: The Estate of Nitza Milagros Marrero Robles, Yaritza Marie Guidicelli Marrero, Jose Wilfredo Velez-Marrero, Modesto Guidicelli-Santiago and Ghitza Marie Velez-Marrero
Case Number: 3:2019cv01606
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia Carreno-Coll
Referring Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear ; granting as requested #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/12/2019. (LE)
August 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear as legal representative, MOTION for Extension of Time until September 11, 2019 to File Answer or responsive pleading filed by Jose R. Franco-Rivera on behalf of Modesto Guidicelli-Santiago Responses due by 8/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Franco-Rivera, Jose)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 Summons by Publication issued as to Yaritza Marie Guidicelli Marrero, Ghitza Marie Velez-Marrero. (Attachments: #1 Summons By publication) (vdm)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting #9 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/25/2019. (AGF)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Issuance of Summons by Publication as to Yaritza Marie Guidicelli Marrero, The Estate of Nitza Milagros Marrero Robles, Ghitza Marie Velez-Marrero filed by Luis G. Parrilla-Hernandez on behalf of Abbey Cayman Asset Company Responses due by 8/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement Under Penalty lof Perjury - GUIDICELLI, #2 Summons by Publication GHITZA M. VELEZ MARRERO, #3 Summons by Publication YARITZA M. GUIDICELLI MARRERO, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Summons by Publication- GUIDICELLI)(Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abbey Cayman Asset Company upon Jose Wilfredo Velez-Marrero served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abbey Cayman Asset Company upon Modesto Guidicelli-Santiago served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #5 Motion for extension of time. Referred to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll for appointment of counsel if qualifies. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/18/2019. (LE)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time of 15 days to retain counsel filed by Modesto Guidicelli-Santiago, Pro se. Responses due by 7/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gmm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Abbey Cayman Asset Company (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Yaritza Marie Guidicelli Marrero, Modesto Guidicelli-Santiago, Ghitza Marie Velez-Marrero, Jose Wilfredo Velez-Marrero (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
June 21, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (ad)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yaritza Marie Guidicelli Marrero, Modesto Guidicelli-Santiago, The Estate of Nitza Milagros Marrero Robles, Ghitza Marie Velez-Marrero, Jose Wilfredo Velez-Marrero ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6463868.), filed by Abbey Cayman Asset Company. Service due by 9/18/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mortgage Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage Deed, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Default, #4 Summons GHITZA MARIE VLEZ MARRERO, #5 Summons JOS WILFREDO VLEZ MARRERO, #6 Summons MODESTO GUIDICELLI SANTIAGO, #7 Summons YARITZA MARIE GUIDICELLI MARRERO, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Sheet)(Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbey Cayman Asset Company v. The Estate of Nitza Milagros Marrero Robles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Nitza Milagros Marrero Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaritza Marie Guidicelli Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Wilfredo Velez-Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modesto Guidicelli-Santiago
Represented By: Jose R. Franco-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghitza Marie Velez-Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbey Cayman Asset Company
Represented By: Luis G. Parrilla-Hernandez
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?