DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc v. Ramos Garcia
Interested Party: US Trustee
Appellee: Federico A Ramos Garcia
Appellant: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01609
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 "Motion for Extension of Time." Brief due not later than August 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/16/2019. (EMJ)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until August 23, 2019 to complete research and drafting of Appellant's Brief filed by Vilmarys M. Quinones-Cintron on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc Responses due by 8/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Cintron, Vilmarys)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. Appellant Brief due by 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal, #2 Appellant's Record on Appeal, #3 Certified Docket)(babk)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting #3 "Motion for Extension of Time." Appellant's brief due August 20, 2019. Appellee's response due not later than September 20, 2019. Replies and sur-replies will be allowed. They should be submitted without further court authorization not later than five (5) days after filing of the motion they are responding to (i.e. opposition or reply). The parties shall deliver a courtesy copy of all dispositive motions in excess of 30 pages, exhibits included, to the Clerks Office Counter of the Hato Rey courthouse in an envelope or box directed to the undersigneds chamber. The copies shall be bound (spiral, binder clip) and exhibits shall be numbered and separated by tabs. The exhibits shall include an index. Courtesy copies are due three (3) days after the corresponding motion was filed. Failure to comply shall result in the corresponding motion being stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/23/2019. (EMJ)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for extension of time until August 20, 2019 to file Appellants Principal Brief filed by Eyck O. Lugo-Rivera on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc Responses due by 8/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lugo-Rivera, Eyck)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 77, #3 Judgment dkt 78, #4 Certified Docket)(babk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc v. Ramos Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Federico A Ramos Garcia
Represented By: Rosana Moreno-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc
Represented By: Vilmarys M. Quinones-Cintron
Represented By: Eyck O. Lugo-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?