Cortes-Diaz v. MSD International GmbH (Puerto Rico Branch) LLC
Plaintiff: Jose A Cortes-Diaz and Jose A. Cortes-Diaz
Defendant: MSD International GmbH (Puerto Rico Branch) LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01611
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Leave to withdraw is Granted to Attorney Barreto. The Clerk is to take notice of the appearance of Attorney Fernandez as new counsel for defendant. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/6/2019. (wm)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Cristina Fernandez-Niggemann on behalf of MSD International GmbH (Puerto Rico Branch) LLC (Fernandez-Niggemann, Cristina)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Lorimar Barreto-Vincenty filed by Lorimar Barreto-Vincenty on behalf of MSD International GmbH (Puerto Rico Branch) LLC Responses due by 8/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Barreto-Vincenty, Lorimar)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Lorimar Barreto-Vincenty on behalf of MSD International GmbH (Puerto Rico Branch) LLC (Barreto-Vincenty, Lorimar)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of Defendant MSD International GmbH (Puerto Rico Branch) LLC.(Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Instance Court, Humacao Superior Part, case number HU2019CV00126. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6466157), filed by MSD International GmbH (Puerto Rico Branch) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III, #4 Exhibit IV, #5 Exhibit V, #6 Exhibit VI, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Category Sheet)(Casillas-Ayala, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortes-Diaz v. MSD International GmbH (Puerto Rico Branch) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Cortes-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Cortes-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSD International GmbH (Puerto Rico Branch) LLC
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Lorimar Barreto-Vincenty
Represented By: Cristina Fernandez-Niggemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?