Ortiz v. USA
Plaintiff: Hiriam Ortiz
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01619
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Motion for extension of time: Compliance is NOTED. Extension of time is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 8/16/2019. (grf)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until September 6, 2019 to Complete case assessment., Motion In Compliance filed by Ivan E. Aponte-Gonzalez on behalf of Hiriam Ortiz Responses due by 8/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Aponte-Gonzalez, Ivan)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Informative Motion and Motion Requesting Order: NOTED. No additional filings by plaintiff Ortiz will be accepted unless they are filed by his appointed attorney, Ivan Aponte-Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/24/2019. (brc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMATIVE Motion/Letter, MOTION requesting Order filed by Hiriam Ortiz, pro se. Responses due by 8/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mcm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re 2 Order. Attorney Ivan Aponte-Gonzalez appointed for Hiriam Ortiz. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/19.(ab)(by mail: Atty. Ivan Aponte-Gonzalez & Hiriam Ortiz
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Complaint. The Clerk will assign a pro bono lawyer for plaintiff Hiram Ortiz pursuant to Local Rule 83L. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/02/2019. (brc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA, filed by Hiriam Ortiz, pro se. Case transferred in from United States Court of Federal Claims; Case Number 18-cv-0980-PEC. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Service due by 9/25/2019, (Attachments: #1 Transfer Letter, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Docket #2, #4 Docket #3, #5 Docket #4, #6 Docket #5, #7 Docket #6, #8 Docket #7, #9 Docket #8, #10 Docket #9, #11 Docket #10, #12 Docket #11, #13 Docket #12, #14 Docket #13, #15 Envelope)(mcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiriam Ortiz
Represented By: Ivan E. Aponte-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?