Vidal-Quidgley v. Popular Securities LLC
Plaintiff: Miguel Vidal-Quidgley
Defendant: Popular Securities LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01634
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff Miguel Vidal-Quidgley's #3 Motion in Compliance is NOTED and his #5 MOTION for Issuance of Summons is GRANTED.The Clerk of the Court is ordered to issue summons for the defendant Popular Securities LLC FORTHWITH. Plaintiff SHALL FILE Proof of Service to the aforementioned defendant thirty (30) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 8/29/19.(JWS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Plaintiffs filed by Luis Elvin Gonzalez-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for PSL)(Gonzalez-Ramos, Luis)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct Civil Sheet and Category Sheet filed by Luis Elvin Gonzalez-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Gonzalez-Ramos, Luis)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 7/3/2019. (arg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6479340.), filed by Miguel Vidal-Quidgley. Service due by 9/30/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. FINRA Order March 19, 2019, #2 Exhibit 2. FINRA Amended Order April 29, 2019, #3 Exhibit 3. FINRA Order June 17, 2019)(Minana, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vidal-Quidgley v. Popular Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Vidal-Quidgley
Represented By: Luis E. Minana
Represented By: Luis Elvin Gonzalez-Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popular Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?