Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II v. Negroni Santos et al
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II
Defendant: Edgard Ivan Negroni Santos, Dinorah Cristina Feliciano Arce, The Conjugal Partnership Negroni-Feliciano, Dinorah Cristina Feliciano-Arce and Edgard Ivan Negroni-Santos
Case Number: 3:2019cv01646
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/26/2019. (ebb)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting (4) "Notice of Dismissal." Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/26/2019. (ebb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to dismiss as to All Defendants filed by Nathalia M. Rivera-Florez on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 8/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Florez, Nathalia)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dinorah Cristina Feliciano-Arce, Edgard Ivan Negroni-Santos, The Conjugal Partnership Negroni-Feliciano (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (vdm)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6484063.), filed by Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II. Service due by 10/3/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit note and allonges, #2 Summons SUMMONS FOR DINORAH, #3 Summons SUMMONS FOR EDGARD, #4 Summons SUMMONS FOR CONJUGAL, #5 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #6 Category Sheet CATEGORY SHEET)(Rivera-Florez, Nathalia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II v. Negroni Santos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgard Ivan Negroni Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinorah Cristina Feliciano Arce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Conjugal Partnership Negroni-Feliciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinorah Cristina Feliciano-Arce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgard Ivan Negroni-Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II
Represented By: Nathalia M. Rivera-Florez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?