Fontanez-Martinez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Fontanez-Martinez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01648
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorneys Office. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 8/12/2019. (jm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (Docket No. 7), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment and all post-trial proceedings. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-1648(BJM). Judge Delgado-Colon is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 07/09/2019. (gr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK as to Gary Cruz-Payano (3): By Order of Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (Docket No. 87), the 86 MOTION for Change of Plea has been randomly referred within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for hearing, and Report and Recommendation. Signed by Clerk on 07/09/2019. (gr) Modified on 7/10/2019 to add Filed in Error/Wrong Case (gr).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE. The case is referred to a Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings and the entry of judgment re #5 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge filed by Elizabeth Fontanez-Martinez. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/9/2019.(wm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (vdm)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Elizabeth Fontanez-Martinez. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Elizabeth Fontanez-Martinez (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Elizabeth Fontanez-Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Elizabeth Fontanez-Martinez. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Elizabeth Fontanez-Martinez Responses due by 7/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontanez-Martinez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Fontanez-Martinez
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?