DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc et al v. Estate of Morales-Huggins
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc, JANE ESTATE ARLEEN MORALES HUGGINS, DOE and JOHN ESTATE ARLEEN MORALES HUGGINS, DOE
Defendant: ARLEEN ANGELICA ESTATE MORALES HUGGINS, Estate of Arleen Angelica Morales-Huggins, Jane Doe, John Doe and Arleen Morales-Huggins
Case Number: 3:2019cv01656
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Motion In Compliance with DE 4, filed by Mariceli Perez-Gonzalez on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 9/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Gonzalez, Mariceli). Added MOTION for extension of time on 9/6/2019 and edit docket text. (mg).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why Plaintiff failed to comply with this Court's Order to Show Cause, Docket No. 4. Show Cause Response due by 9/5/2019. Failure to comply with the Court's Order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal for failure to diligently prosecute and/or failure to include indispensable parties. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/30/2019. (MQ)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Under Puerto Rico law, an Estate cannot be individually sued, as it does not have juridical personality. See Fuentes v. Tribunal de Distrito y Fuentes, Interventor, 73 D.P.R. 959, 987 (P.R. Oct. 17, 1952) (citing Sucn. Belaval v. Acosta, 64 D.P.R. 109, 111 (P.R. July 29, 1944); Viera v. Sucn. Goitia, 55 D.P.R. 299, 303 (P.R. July 14, 1939); Sucn. Rodriguez v. Comision Indus. de P.R., 53 D.P.R. 825, 835 (P.R. Nov. 9, 1938); Arvelo et al. v. Banco Territorial y Agricola de P.R., 25 D.P.R. 728 (P.R. July 27, 1917)). Rather, all the heirs to a specific Estate must be named in the suit. Fuentes, 73 D.P.R. at 987. Plaintiff must show it has met its burden of including all heirs by providing the decedent's will or, in the absence of a will, a judicial declaration of heirship to ascertain the identities of all the heirs. See Civ. No. 16-1966, Docket No. 32. Thus, the Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to submit to this Court either (a) a copy of the decedent's will, or (b) a negative certification of will along with a judicial declaration of heirship. Show Cause Response due by 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/21/2019. (MQ)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jane Doe, John Doe (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Estate of Arleen Angelica Morales-Huggins, John Doe and Jane Doe (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6489667.), filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. Service due by 10/7/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons against Estate of Arleen Angelica Morales-Huggins , #5 Summons, #6 Summons, against Jane Doe #(7) Exhibit NOTE, #8 Exhibit MORTGAGE)(Perez-Gonzalez, Mariceli) Modified on 7/10/2019 to correct parties and replace all caps text. (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc et al v. Estate of Morales-Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARLEEN ANGELICA ESTATE MORALES HUGGINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Arleen Angelica Morales-Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arleen Morales-Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc
Represented By: Mariceli Perez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE ESTATE ARLEEN MORALES HUGGINS, DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN ESTATE ARLEEN MORALES HUGGINS, DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?