Ramirez-Montanez v. Commissioner social security
Plaintiff: Hilda Ivette Ramirez-Montanez
Defendant: Commissioner social security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01658
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 Due to an oversight, Summons Issued as to US Attorney's Office - District of Puerto Rico was not issued with the others on 07/15/2019. (ad)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Summons to be issued. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 7/11/2019. (cvr)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (Docket No. 7), this case is assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive for all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 19-1658(CVR). Judge Delgado-Colon is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 07/11/2019. (gr)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE re #5 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge filed by Hilda Ivette Ramirez-Montanez. The case is referred to a Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings and the entry of judgment Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/11/2019.(wm)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Hilda Ivette Ramirez-Montanez. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Hilda Ivette Ramirez-Montanez (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner social security, filed by Hilda Ivette Ramirez-Montanez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Hilda Ivette Ramirez-Montanez. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Hilda Ivette Ramirez-Montanez Responses due by 7/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez-Montanez v. Commissioner social security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner social security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Ivette Ramirez-Montanez
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?