Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company v. Fernandez-Colberg
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company
Defendant: PEDRO JAIME FERNANDEZ-COLBERG
Case Number: 3:2019cv01664
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company upon Pedro Jaime Fernandez-Colberg served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pedro Jaime Fernandez-Colberg (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pedro Jaime Fernandez-Colberg ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6493961.), filed by Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company. Service due by 10/9/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage Note, #2 Exhibit order lifting the automatic stay, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company v. Fernandez-Colberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEDRO JAIME FERNANDEZ-COLBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?