Albino-Matias v. Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH ALBINO MATIAS and Elizabeth Albino-Matias
Defendant: JOHN FOE, Jane Roe, MAYRA LOPEZ-ACEVEDO, JAMES LOPEZ-ACEVEDO, INSURANCE XYZ, COMPANY ABC, Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico and Insurance Company XYZ
Case Number: 3:2019cv01669
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer deadline September 18, 2019. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/20/2019. (brc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 18, 2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Elizabeth Albino-Matias filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico, JAMES LOPEZ-ACEVEDO, MAYRA LOPEZ-ACEVEDO (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6496541.), filed by ELIZABETH ALBINO MATIAS. Service due by 10/10/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summon, #4 Summons Summon, #5 Summons Summon, #6 Summons Summon, #7 Summons Summon, #8 Summons Summon, #9 Summons Summon)(Cobian-Roig, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albino-Matias v. Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN FOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYRA LOPEZ-ACEVEDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES LOPEZ-ACEVEDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSURANCE XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPANY ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jorge Carazo-Quetglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH ALBINO MATIAS
Represented By: Manuel Cobian-Roig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Albino-Matias
Represented By: Manuel Cobian-Roig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?