Ayala-Pachecho v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: JOSYMAR AYALA-PACHECO
Defendant: Rosa E. Rodriguez-Velez, William P. Barr, THE GENERAL COUNSEL, Nancy A. Berryhill and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01678
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Referring Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (Docket No. 4), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez for Report and Recommendation, or for disposition if consent is provided. Signed by Clerk on 07/25/2019. (gr)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Josymar Ayala-Pacheco. GRANTED. The case is hereby referred to a Magistrate Judge for report and recommendation or for disposition were consent to be provided. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/25/2019.(wm)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nydia Gonzalez-Ortiz on behalf of Josymar Ayala-Pacheco. Responses due by 7/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Ortiz, Nydia) Modified on 7/18/2019 to remove caps (rom).
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Josymar Ayala-Pacheco. Service due by 10/15/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Gonzalez-Ortiz, Nydia) Modified on 7/18/2019 to remove caps (rom).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayala-Pachecho v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa E. Rodriguez-Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GENERAL COUNSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSYMAR AYALA-PACHECO
Represented By: Nydia Gonzalez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?