Banesco USA v. Centro Citopatologico del Caribe, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Banesco USA
Defendant: Katherine Davila Morales, Armando Troche-Olivieri, Eliud Lopez-Velez, Laboratorio Clnico el Centro, Inc, Puerto Rico Institute of Pathology, Inc, Centro Citopatolgico del Caribe, Inc, Cristina Gomez-D'Angelo, Conjugal Legal Partnership Troche-Dvila, Oficinas del Centro, Inc, Conjugal Partnership Troche-Davila, Laboratorio Clinico el Centro, Inc, Centro Citopatologico del Caribe, Inc and Katherine Davila-Morales
Case Number: 3:2019cv01697
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banesco USA upon Eliud Lopez-Velez served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banesco USA upon Puerto Rico Institute of Pathology, Inc served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banesco USA upon Cristina Gomez-D'Angelo served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banesco USA upon Oficinas del Centro, Inc served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banesco USA upon Conjugal Partnership Troche-Davila served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banesco USA upon Laboratorio Clinico el Centro, Inc served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banesco USA upon Centro Citopatologico del Caribe, Inc served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banesco USA upon Armando Troche-Olivieri served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banesco USA upon Katherine Davila-Morales served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Noting #8 "Motion Submitting Certified Translations." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/14/2019.(EMJ)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents MOTION for Extension of Time until AUGUST 18, 2019 to file CERTIFIED ENGLISH TRANSLATIONS filed by Banesco USA, #1 Complaint,,,,,, filed by Banesco USA, 7 Terminate Motions, Order filed by Luis G. Parrilla-Hernandez on behalf of Banesco USA Responses due by 8/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 - Promissory Note - trad, REV 7-26-19 - CERT. TRANSLATIONS, #2 Exhibit 5 - Escritura_#35_Primera Hipoteca_Mariela Garca Colberg ENG, REV 7-26-19 - CERT. TRANSLATIONS, #3 Exhibit 6 - Promissory Note trad, REV 7-26-19 - CERT. TRANSLATIONS, #4 Exhibit 7 - Escritura_#64_Primera Hipoteca_Mariela Garca Colberg ENG, REV 7-26-19 - CERT TRANSLATIONS)(Related document(s) #2 , #1 , 7 ) (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #2 "Motion for Leave to File Spanish Language Documents." Certified translations due not later than August 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/24/2019. (EMJ)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Centro Citopatologico del Caribe, Inc, Conjugal Partnership Troche-Davila, Katherine Davila-Morales, Cristina Gomez-D'Angelo, Laboratorio Clinico el Centro, Inc, Eliud Lopez-Velez, Oficinas del Centro, Inc, Puerto Rico Institute of Pathology, Inc, Armando Troche-Olivieri (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Noting #4 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/23/2019. (ebb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Banesco USA (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until AUGUST 18, 2019 to file CERTIFIED ENGLISH TRANSLATIONS filed by Luis G. Parrilla-Hernandez on behalf of Banesco USA Responses due by 8/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Centro Citopatolgico del Caribe, Inc, Conjugal Legal Partnership Troche-Dvila, Katherine Davila Morales, Cristina Gomez-D'Angelo, Laboratorio Clnico el Centro, Inc, Eliud Lopez-Velez, Oficinas del Centro, Inc, Puerto Rico Institute of Pathology, Inc, Armando Troche-Olivieri ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6507296.), filed by Banesco USA. Service due by 10/17/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Summons Armando Troche Olivieri, #44 Summons Centro Citopatologico del Caribe, #45 Summons Cristina Gomez D'Angelo, #46 Summons Eliud Lopez Velez, #47 Summons Katherine Davila Morales, #48 Summons Conjugal Legal Partnership Troche-Davila, #49 Summons Laboratorio Clinico el Centro Inc., #50 Summons Oficinas del Centro Inc., #51 Summons PR Institute of Pathology, #52 Category Sheet, #53 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banesco USA v. Centro Citopatologico del Caribe, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Davila Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Troche-Olivieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliud Lopez-Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratorio Clnico el Centro, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Institute of Pathology, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centro Citopatolgico del Caribe, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristina Gomez-D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Legal Partnership Troche-Dvila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oficinas del Centro, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Troche-Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratorio Clinico el Centro, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centro Citopatologico del Caribe, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Davila-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banesco USA
Represented By: Luis G. Parrilla-Hernandez
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?