CF Breeze Recovery, LLC v. Caribe Tecno, CRL et al
Plaintiff: CF Breeze Recovery, LLC
Defendant: CNA Surety Corp., Caribe Tecno, CRL and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01704
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/20/2019. (EES)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to answer and/or Otherwise Plead. Answer to amended complaint due on or before October 3, 2019. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/17/2019. (jg)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER noted #13 INFORMATIVE motion in compliance with docket #10. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/18/2019. (jg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance and First Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Fabian Rodriguez-Torres on behalf of All Defendants (Rodriguez-Torres, Fabian) Modified on 9/4/2019 edit text (gav). Modified on 9/18/2019 to add "mallet" (xi).
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Compliance with Docket No. 10 filed by Richard Schell-Asad on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Schell-Asad, Richard)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear and Extension of Time filed by Mirelis Valle-Cancel on behalf of Caribe Tecno, CRL Responses due by 9/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valle-Cancel, Mirelis) Modified on 8/22/2019 edit text(gav).
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Schell-Asad, Richard)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #5 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Western Surety Company filed by CF Breeze Recovery, LLC. "The plaintiff shall file a list of its members and their residences within 14 days of the date of this order. Should any of the members themselves be LLCs, they shall list their members and residences."Signed by Judge William G. Young on 8/14/2019.(EES)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Issuance of Summons as to defendant Western Surety Company. Summons to issue forthwith. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 8/14/2019. (jg)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER noted #6 Motion Reiterating Request for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 8/14/2019. (jg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Western Surety Company filed by Richard Schell-Asad on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Schell-Asad, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Western Surety Company filed by Richard Schell-Asad on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Western Surety Compay)(Schell-Asad, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CF Breeze Recovery, LLC.(Schell-Asad, Richard)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CNA Surety Corp., Caribe Tecno, CRL (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6509584.), filed by CF Breeze Recovery, LLC. Service due by 10/21/2019, (Attachments: #1 Summons Initializing Documents and 2 Summons)(Schell-Asad, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CF Breeze Recovery, LLC v. Caribe Tecno, CRL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CF Breeze Recovery, LLC
Represented By: Richard Schell-Asad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Surety Corp.
Represented By: Fabian Rodriguez-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribe Tecno, CRL
Represented By: Fabian Rodriguez-Torres
Represented By: Mirelis Valle-Cancel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Fabian Rodriguez-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?