Santiago-Lebron et al v. Tote Maritime Puerto Rico, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Between Samuel Santiago and Lourdes Santos, Samuel Santiago, Lourdes Santos, Samuel Santiago-Lebron and Conjugal Partnership Santiago-Santos
Defendant: Tote Maritime Puerto Rico, LLC, Insurance Company B, John Doe, Richard Roe and Insurance Company A
Case Number: 3:2019cv01716
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe, Insurance Company A, Insurance Company B, Richard Roe, Tote Maritime Puerto Rico, LLC, filed by Conjugal Partnership Santiago-Santos, Lourdes Santos, Samuel Santiago-Lebron.(Cobian-Roig, Eduardo)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re #1 Complaint. Plaintiffs are allowed until September 5, 2019 to file an amended complaint in accordance with this memorandum and order. Failure to do so may entail the dismissal of the complaint, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/22/2019. (brc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet, and Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, filed by Lourdes Santos, Samuel Santiago, Conjugal Partnership Between Samuel Santiago and Lourdes Santos (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cobian-Roig, Eduardo)
July 26, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #4 Notice of Filing Exhibits, #3 Notice of Filing Exhibits. ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel will re-file document.*** (mcm)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR- Counsel will re-file.*** NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet JS44. (Cobian-Roig, Eduardo) Modified on 7/26/2019 (mcm).
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel will re-file.*** NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet. (Cobian-Roig, Eduardo) Modified on 7/26/2019 (mcm).
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). (arg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, Insurance Company A, Insurance Company B, Richard Roe, Tote Maritime Puerto Rico, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6514281.), filed by Conjugal Partnership Between Samuel Santiago and Lourdes Santos, Lourdes Santos, Samuel Santiago. Service due by 10/23/2019,(Cobian-Roig, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago-Lebron et al v. Tote Maritime Puerto Rico, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tote Maritime Puerto Rico, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Between Samuel Santiago and Lourdes Santos
Represented By: Eduardo J. Cobian-Roig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Santiago
Represented By: Eduardo J. Cobian-Roig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes Santos
Represented By: Eduardo J. Cobian-Roig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Santiago-Lebron
Represented By: Eduardo J. Cobian-Roig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Santiago-Santos
Represented By: Eduardo J. Cobian-Roig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?