Dumont-Vega v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Angel Luis Dumont Vega and Angel Luis Dumont-Vega
Defendant: Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, 3M Occupational Safey LLC, Aearo Holdings LLC, Aearo LLC and 3M Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01723
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Case transferred from Puerto Rico has been opened in Northern District of Florida as case 3:19-cv-03179, filed 08/20/2019. (ab)
August 20, 2019 Case transferred out to the Northern District of Florida through the extract civil case utility, sending e-mail to InterdistrictTransfer_FLND@flnd.uscourts.gov (ab)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFIED COPY OF CTO-25 received from the Northern District of Florida. (ab)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, 3M Occupational Safey LLC, Aearo Holdings LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo LLC and Aearo Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-25) for the transfer of this case to N.D. of Florida. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Tag Along Actions, #2 NEF) (ab)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Order to involved Clerks entered in MDL #2885 informing of the electronic transfer to the Northern District of Florida. Order becomes effective upon receipt of a certified copy of CTO-25 from the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 8/15/2019. (ab)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint Request for Summons (Rivera-Velez, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint Request for Summons (Rivera-Velez, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint Request for Summons (Rivera-Velez, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint Request for Summons (Rivera-Velez, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint Request for Summons (Rivera-Velez, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint Request for Summons (Rivera-Velez, William)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 Motion to Appear PHV: GRANTED. The Clerk will deposit the admission fee in the Court's non-appropriated funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/30/2019. (brc)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Motion to Appear PHV: GRANTED. The Clerk will deposit the admission fee in the Court's non-appropriated funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/30/2019. (brc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to allow Michael Burns to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6519600) filed by William Rivera-Velez on behalf of Angel Luis Dumont-Vega Responses due by 8/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivera-Velez, William)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to allow Caroline Maida to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6519572) filed by William Rivera-Velez on behalf of Angel Luis Dumont-Vega Responses due by 8/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivera-Velez, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6516098.), filed by Angel Luis Dumont Vega. Service due by 10/24/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rivera-Velez, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dumont-Vega v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Intermediate LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Occupational Safey LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Luis Dumont Vega
Represented By: William Rivera-Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Luis Dumont-Vega
Represented By: William Rivera-Velez
Represented By: Michael A. Burns
Represented By: Caroline L. Maida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?