Ramirez v. St Clair Collection, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Antonio Ramirez
Defendant: ABC Corporations, Jane Doe, Ticket 2 Puerto Rico, LLC, John Doe, PITTS St Clair LLC, St Clair Collection, LLC and XYZ Insurance Companies
Case Number: 3:2019cv01735
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: (i) Joint Initial Scheduling Memorandum due by 10/4/2019; (ii) Joint Pretrial Memorandum due by 8/6/2020; (iii) Pretrial/Settlement Conference set for 8/13/2020; and (iv) Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/27/2019. (JG)
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Dora M. Penagaricano-Suarez on behalf of Defendants PITTS St Clair LLC, St Clair Collection, LLC, Ticket 2 Puerto Rico, LLC.(Penagaricano-Suarez, Dora)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting co-Defendants (i) St. Clair Collection, LLC; (ii) PIITS St. Clair LLC; and (iii) Ticket 2 Puerto Rico, LLC's #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Answer (or pleading) due by 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/25/2019. (JG)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER vacating 10 Order of Recusal. See Docket Nos. 11; 12; 13. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/25/2019. (JG)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order entered by Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 12), this case has been transferred back to the docket of Senior Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. Signed by Clerk on 08/30/2019. (ft)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re 10 Order of Recusal. Because no TRO or preliminary injunction is requested, this case is returned to the docket of Senior Judge Garcia-Gregory. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/30/2019. (brc)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal entered by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (Docket No. 10), this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Clerk on 08/29/2019. (gr)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ***VACATED AS PER D.E. #14 ORDER*** ORDER OF RECUSAL: Upon attaining senior status, Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory no longer accept cases where injunctive relief is being sought. See Docket No. 1 at 9-10. The Clerk of Court shall take notice and re-assign the present action. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/29/2019. (JG) Modified on 9/26/2019 (mg).
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/26/2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Jorge Antonio Ramirez filed by Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle on behalf of PITTS St Clair LLC, St Clair Collection, LLC, Ticket 2 Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 9/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Lopez-Del Valle, Sonia)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle on behalf of PITTS St Clair LLC, St Clair Collection, LLC, Ticket 2 Puerto Rico, LLC (Lopez-Del Valle, Sonia)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dora M. Penagaricano-Suarez on behalf of PITTS St Clair LLC, St Clair Collection, LLC, Ticket 2 Puerto Rico, LLC (Penagaricano-Suarez, Dora)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Antonio Ramirez upon PITTS St Clair LLC served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; St Clair Collection, LLC served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; Ticket 2 Puerto Rico, LLC served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
August 3, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #5 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR. Document lacking electronic signature and Certificate of Service. Counsel to re-file*** (gmm)
August 3, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR-LACKING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE*** NOTICE of Appearance As Additional Counsel by Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rivera-Aspinall, Julian) Modified on 8/5/2019 (gmm).
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to PITTS St Clair LLC, St Clair Collection, LLC, Ticket 2 Puerto Rico, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
August 1, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #2 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT PDF. Document was uploaded as a fillable PDF and appears blank. Counsel to re-file. *** (rom)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT PDF.*** NOTICE of Appearance As Additional Counsel by Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rivera-Aspinall, Julian) Modified on 8/2/2019 (rom).
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6522969.), filed by Jorge Antonio Ramirez. Service due by 10/30/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Infringed Photos, #2 Exhibit Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit Infringing websites, #4 Exhibit Infringing Advertising, #5 Summons SCC, #6 Summons PITTS, #7 Summons T2PR, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Sheet)(Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. St Clair Collection, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticket 2 Puerto Rico, LLC
Represented By: Dora M. Penagaricano-Suarez
Represented By: Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITTS St Clair LLC
Represented By: Dora M. Penagaricano-Suarez
Represented By: Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Clair Collection, LLC
Represented By: Dora M. Penagaricano-Suarez
Represented By: Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Antonio Ramirez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?