Morales-Torres v. USA
Petitioner: Jose Morales-Torres
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01743
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Noted #9 Informative motion. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 09/30/2019. (CRH)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Juan R. Acevedo-Cruz on behalf of Jose Morales-Torres Responses due by 10/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Acevedo-Cruz, Juan)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The motion is granted until October 15, 2019 given the volume of Section 2255 petitions the U.S. Attorney is simultaneously handling. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/27/2019. (AGF)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 26, 2019 to File Response/Reply filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 9/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Noted #4 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/14/2019. (AGF)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Noted #3 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/14/2019. (AGF)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Juan R. Acevedo-Cruz on behalf of Jose Morales-Torres Responses due by 8/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Acevedo-Cruz, Juan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Juan R. Acevedo-Cruz on behalf of Jose Morales-Torres Responses due by 8/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Acevedo-Cruz, Juan)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-251) filed by Jose Morales-Torres. The government shall respond by 8/25/2019. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/8/2019.(sc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-251 GAG) filed by Juan R. Acevedo-Cruz on behalf of Jose Morales-Torres. Responses due by 8/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit)(gmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales-Torres v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Morales-Torres
Represented By: Juan R. Acevedo-Cruz
Represented By: Jeremy Brian Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?