Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc. v. Central General de Trabajadores et al
Plaintiff: Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc.
Defendant: Central General de Trabajadores, THE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR AND HUMAN RESOURCES and Department of Labor and Human Resources
Case Number: 3:2019cv01744
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia Carreno-Coll
Referring Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #20 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim as to Department of Labor and Human Resources filed by Department of Labor and Human Resources is referred to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll for a hearing, if necessary, and a Report and Recommendation under Local Civ. R. 72. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time at ECF No. 21 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/27/2019.(wm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc. (Rodriguez-Velez, Paul)
September 16, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for extension of time until 09/30/19 to Oppose MTD filed at Docket No. 20 filed by Paul Rodriguez-Velez on behalf of Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc. Responses due by 9/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Velez, Paul)
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim as to Department of Labor and Human Resources filed by Michel Mir-Martinez on behalf of Department of Labor and Human Resources Responses due by 9/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mir-Martinez, Michel)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 Supplemental Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order (ECF No. 18) is GRANTED IN PART. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/27/2019. (wm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION Submitting Supplemental Request for TRO and Injunctive Relief filed by Paul Rodriguez-Velez on behalf of Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc. Responses due by 9/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Velez, Paul)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, noted Notice of Appearance. Answer to Complaint due by 8/30/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 8/26/2019. (VCC)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for Extension of Time to file Answer by Michel Mir-Martinez on behalf of Department of Labor and Human Resources (Mir-Martinez, Michel) Modified on 8/21/2019 to add motion and edit title (mcm).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER noted #12 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/14/2019. (wm)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal entered by Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin (Docket No. 13), this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll for a hearing on the request for preliminary and permanent injunction, and declaratory relief, and issuance of a Report and Recommendation (see, Order at Docket No. 9 entered by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon). Signed by Clerk on 08/08/2019. (gr)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself from participating in this case. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 8/8/2019. (jm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION Submitting Proof of Service of Summonses and TRO Order filed by Paul Rodriguez-Velez on behalf of Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc. Responses due by 8/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Order Served On Dept. of Labor, #2 Exhibit Summons and Order Served on Dept. of Justice, #3 Exhibit Summons and Order Served on CGT)(Rodriguez-Velez, Paul)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/6/2019. (wm)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By #9 Order of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon, this case has been directly referred within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for a hearing on the request for preliminary and permanent injunction, and declaratory relief, and issuance of a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Clerk on 08/05/2019. (gr)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION AND ORDER re #3 MOTION requesting Order filed by Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc. The Court GRANTS plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order. Co-defendants Central General de Trabajadores and the Department of Labor and Human Resources of Puerto Rico are enjoined from requesting or compelling plaintiff to attend the arbitration hearing scheduled for August 7, 2019; Plaintiff shall execute summons within five (5) days from the date of issuance of this Order; Co-defendants Central General de Trabajadores and the Department of Labor and Human Resources of Puerto Rico shall file their answers to the complaint and responses to plaintiff's request for preliminary and permanent injunction and for declaratory relief within fifteen (15) days from service of summons; and Plaintiff's request for preliminary and permanent injunction and for declaratory relief ECF No. 1, 2, are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for the holding of a hearing as soon as feasible and for the issuance of a Report and Recommendation, pursuant to Local Civ. R. 72(a). Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/5/2019.(wm)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Submitting Proposed Order filed by Paul Rodriguez-Velez on behalf of Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc. Responses due by 8/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez-Velez, Paul)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ada Nurie Pagan-Isona on behalf of Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc. (Pagan-Isona, Ada)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos Concepcion-Castro on behalf of Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc. (Concepcion-Castro, Carlos)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Central General de Trabajadores, Department of Labor and Human Resources. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 8/5/2019 to remove caps (rom).
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Requesting Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary and Permanent Injunction filed by Paul Rodriguez-Velez on behalf of Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc. Responses due by 8/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Velez, Paul) Modified on 8/5/2019 to edit event (rom).
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Submitting Memorandum of Law in Support of Request for Injunctive Relief filed by Paul Rodriguez-Velez on behalf of Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc. Responses due by 8/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Rodriguez-Velez, Paul)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief & Declaratory Judgment against Central General de Trabajadores, Department of Labor and Human Resources ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6525785.), filed by Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc.. Service due by 10/31/2019, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez-Velez, Paul) Modified on 8/5/2019 to remove caps (rom).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc. v. Central General de Trabajadores et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central General de Trabajadores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR AND HUMAN RESOURCES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor and Human Resources
Represented By: Michel Mir-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cadillac Uniform & Linen Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Rodriguez-Velez
Represented By: Ada Nurie Pagan-Isona
Represented By: Carlos Concepcion-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?