DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS MEMBER CASE - CASE HAS BEEN MERGED WITH LEAD CASE 19-1516 (DRD)
Plaintiff: Caribe Power Corp. and Julio Blanco-D'Arcy
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01770
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION re 16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Aspen American Insurance Company. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 8/20/2019.(EES) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Aspen American Insurance Company is to answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/20/2019. (EA)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 3, 2019 to File Answer to Amended Complaint or Dispositive Motion filed by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of Aspen American Insurance Company Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Certified English translations due by 9/11/2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/14/2019. (EA)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aspen American Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents (Criado-Mangual, Sergio) Modified on 8/13/2019 edit text (gav).
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of Aspen American Insurance Company Responses due by 8/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Commonwealth of Puerto Rico's Court of First Instance, Superior Court of Humacao, case number SJ2018CV07569. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6537596), filed by Aspen American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Cert. Trans Complaint, #5 Exhibit Cerk's Notice, #6 Exhibit Motion Submitting Corrected Summons, #7 Exhibit Order, #8 Exhibit Order, #9 Exhibit Issued Summons, #10 Exhibit Blue Waters Executed Summons, #11 Exhibit Motion in Compliance, #12 Exhibit No Debt Certification, #13 Exhibit Order, #14 Exhibit Order Transferring Case, #15 Exhibit Extension of Time to Plead, #16 Exhibit Order, #17 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #18 Exhibit Certified Translation Motion to Dismiss, #19 Exhibit Order, #20 Exhibit Joint Motion, #21 Exhibit Order, #22 Exhibit Motion to Serve by Publication, #23 Exhibit Order, #24 Exhibit Motion in Compliance, #25 Exhibit Order, #26 Exhibit Service by Publication, #27 Exhibit Waiver, #28 Exhibit Partial Judgment, #29 Exhibit Acosta Motion to Dismiss, #30 Exhibit Clerk's Notice, #31 Exhibit Order, #32 Exhibit Order, #33 Exhibit Motion in Compliance, #34 Exhibit Order, #35 Exhibit "Opposition" to Motion to Dismiss, #36 Exhibit Joint Motion, #37 Exhibit Cert. Trans Joint Motion, #38 Exhibit Order, #39 Exhibit Order, #40 Exhibit Partial Motion in Compliance, #41 Exhibit Second Partial Motion in Compliance, #42 Exhibit Order, #43 Exhibit Order, #44 Exhibit Motion to Compel, #45 Exhibit Cert. Trans Motion to Compel, #46 Exhibit Intent to Oppose, #47 Exhibit Order, #48 Exhibit Order, #49 Exhibit Substitution Legal Counsel, #50 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #51 Exhibit Opposition to Motion to Compel, #52 Exhibit Cert. Trans First Amended Complaint, #53 Exhibit Cert. Trans Opposition to Motion to Compel, #54 Exhibit Order, #55 Exhibit Order, #56 Exhibit Order, #57 Exhibit Hearing Minutes, #58 Exhibit Order)(Criado-Mangual, Sergio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS MEMBER CASE - CASE HAS BEEN MERGED WITH LEAD CASE 19-1516 (DRD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caribe Power Corp.
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Blanco-D'Arcy
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company
Represented By: Sergio Criado-Mangual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?