Cruz-Marrero v. CPC Carolina PR, LLC
Plaintiff: Wanda Ivelisse Fernandez Cruz, Liza Maria Fernandez Cruz, Edgardo Jose Fernandez Cruz, Ramon Fernandez Cruz, Maria Teresa Cruz Marrero and Javier Francisco Fernandez Cruz
Defendant: A, B & C Insurance Companies, Jane Doe, KRB Universal Investments, LLC, Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy LLC, CPC Carolina PR, LLC and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv01776
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (Docket No. 9), this case is transferred to the docket of Judge William G. Young, who presides over related case 18-cv-1555-WGY and has consented to said transfer (see, 18-cv-1555 at Docket No. 40). Signed by Clerk on 10/02/2019. (gr)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jesus E. Cuza-Abdala on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy LLC Responses due by 10/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cuza-Abdala, Jesus)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 30, 2019 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint filed by Teichka M. Rodriguez-Munoz on behalf of CPC Carolina PR, LLC. Responses due by 10/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rodriguez-Munoz, Teichka) Modified docket text on 10/2/2019 (idg).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs' #5 INFORMATIVE motion is NOTED. The Court has no objection to the consolidation of this case with Civ. 18-1555 if so ordered by Honorable William G. Young. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 9/27/2019. (LAD)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to KRB Universal Investments LLC served on 9/17/2019 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rodriguez-Garayalde, Angel) Modified title and added service date on 9/25/2019 (idg).
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy LLC served on 9/9/2019 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rodriguez-Garayalde, Angel) Modified title and added service date on 9/25/2019 (idg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by All Plaintiffs as to CPC Carolina PR LLC served on 9/9/2019. (Rodriguez-Garayalde, Angel) Modified event, title and added service date on 9/17/2019 (idg).
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Motion to Consolidate with Older Case filed by Saulo A. Velez-Rios on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Consolidate)(Velez-Rios, Saulo)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rodriguez-Garayalde, Angel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CPC Carolina PR, LLC, KRB Universal Investments, LLC, Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6539142.), filed by Wanda Ivelisse Fernandez Cruz, Edgardo Jose Fernandez Cruz, Ramon Fernandez Cruz, Maria Teresa Cruz Marrero, Liza Maria Fernandez Cruz, Javier Francisco Fernandez Cruz. Service due by 11/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons CPC Carolina PR LLC, #4 Summons PR CVS Pharmacy LLC, #5 Summons KRB Universal Investments LLC)(Velez-Rios, Saulo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz-Marrero v. CPC Carolina PR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Ivelisse Fernandez Cruz
Represented By: Saulo A. Velez-Rios
Represented By: Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Maria Fernandez Cruz
Represented By: Saulo A. Velez-Rios
Represented By: Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgardo Jose Fernandez Cruz
Represented By: Saulo A. Velez-Rios
Represented By: Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Fernandez Cruz
Represented By: Saulo A. Velez-Rios
Represented By: Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Cruz Marrero
Represented By: Saulo A. Velez-Rios
Represented By: Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Francisco Fernandez Cruz
Represented By: Saulo A. Velez-Rios
Represented By: Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A, B & C Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRB Universal Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Jesus E. Cuza-Abdala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPC Carolina PR, LLC
Represented By: Teichka M. Rodriguez-Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?