Bueb et al v. Sayre
Plaintiff: Sandor Meijn and Emmanuel Bueb
Defendant: Michael David Sayre
Case Number: 3:2019cv01784
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 14, 2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by Michael David Sayre, Pro se. Responses due by 10/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (gav)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael David Sayre (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6542063.), filed by Emmanuel Bueb, Sandor Meijn. Service due by 11/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Category Sheet)(Rivera-Pagan, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bueb et al v. Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandor Meijn
Represented By: Monica Rivera-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Bueb
Represented By: Monica Rivera-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael David Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?