United States of America v. Luna Malave et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Carmen Maria Espada Garcia, Angel Luis Luna Malave, Conjugal Partnership Luna-Espada, Hector Rafael Luna-Espada, Luis Gerardo Luna-Espada, Maria de los Angeles Luna-Espada, Sonia Noemi Luna-Espada and Edgardo Luna-Espada
Case Number: 3:2019cv01786
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER noted #4 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/30/2019. (EA)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Carmen Maria Espada Garcia, Edgardo Luna-Espada, Hector Rafael Luna-Espada, Luis Gerardo Luna-Espada, Maria de los Angeles Luna-Espada, Sonia Noemi Luna-Espada (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons Edgardo Luna Espada, #2 Summons Maria de los Angeles Luna Espada, #3 Summons Hector Rafael Luna Espada, #4 Summons Sonia Noemi Luna Espada, #5 Summons Luis Geraldo Luna Espada, #6 Summons Carmen Maria Espada Garcia)(Fortuno-Fas, Juan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 10/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unsworn Statement)(Fortuno-Fas, Juan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Luna-Espada, Carmen Maria Espada Garcia, Angel Luis Luna Malave (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Service due by 11/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit $300,000 Note, #2 Exhibit Deed 136, #3 Exhibit Property 14,332, #4 Exhibit COI, #5 Exhibit SCRA's, #6 Summons Angel Luis Luna Malave, #7 Summons Carmen Maria Espada Malave, #8 Summons Conjugal Partnership Luna-Espada, #9 Category Sheet, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fortuno-Fas, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Luna Malave et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Maria Espada Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Luis Luna Malave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Luna-Espada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Rafael Luna-Espada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Gerardo Luna-Espada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria de los Angeles Luna-Espada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Noemi Luna-Espada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo Luna-Espada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Juan C. Fortuno-Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?