Torres-Santos v. National Western Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MR. NESTOR TORRES-SANTOS
Defendant: NATIONAL WESTERN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, John Doe, Insurance Company X and Insurance Company Y
Case Number: 3:2019cv01789
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Referring Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: By October 16, 2019, defendant shall file a response to the motion requesting injunctive relief (ECF No. 9). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 10/9/2019. (JZ)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Due to the immediate unavailability of Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll, the #9 MOTION Requesting Injunctive Relief has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez for hearing, if appropriate, and Report and Recommendation (see, Docket No. 10). Magistrate Judge Carreno-Coll no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 10/09/2019. (gr) Modified on 10/9/2019 to add magistrate judge's name (gr).
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (Docket No. 10), the #9 MOTION for Injunctive Relief has been randomly referred to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll for hearing, if appropriate, and Report and Recommendation. Signed by Clerk on 10/08/2019. (gr)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Defendant National Western's #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED. Answer is due 10/31/19.Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 10/8/19.(JWS)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff Nestor Torres-Santos' #9 Motion for Injunctive Relief is REFERRED to the United States Magistrate Judge for hearing, if appropriate, and for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 10/8/19.(JWS)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION INJUCTION RELIEF filed by Ricardo A. Alvarez-Westwood on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Alvarez-Westwood, Ricardo)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nestor Torres-Santos.(Alvarez-Westwood, Ricardo)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of National Western Life Insurance Company (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Process and Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #5 Notice (Other) filed by Nestor Torres-Santos filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of National Western Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Garcia-Benitez, Carla) Modified title on 9/20/2019 (idg).
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6546013.) filed by Nestor Torres-Santos (Alvarez-Westwood, Ricardo) Modified title on 8/22/2019 (idg).
August 19, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #2 Notice of Filing Exhibits. ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-filed.*** (idg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL WESTERN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo. (vdm)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-filed.***NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Alvarez-Westwood, Ricardo) Modified to file in error on 8/20/2019 (idg).
August 16, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #1 Complaint. ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-filed.*** (idg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-filed.*** COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6546013.), filed by NESTOR TORRES-SANTOS. Service due by 11/14/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Alvarez-Westwood, Ricardo) Modified to file in error on 8/20/2019 (idg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres-Santos v. National Western Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MR. NESTOR TORRES-SANTOS
Represented By: Ricardo A. Alvarez-Westwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL WESTERN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company Y
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?