Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC v. Punta Lima Development Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC
Defendant: Punta Lima Development Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01800
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (Docket No. 18), this case is transferred to the docket of Judge Francisco A. Besosa who has consented to said transfer for consolidation with lead case 19-cv-1673-FAB (see, 19-cv-1673-FAB at Docket No. 25). Signed by Clerk on 09/05/2019. (gr)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER noted #14 INFORMATIVE motion; and noted and moot #14 Motion to Consolidate Cases. See Order at Dkt. No. 18 . Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/5/2019. (EA)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The undersigned and Judge Francisco A. Besosa have agreed that both this case and Case No. 19-1673 (FAB) should be consolidated. Given that Judge Francisco A. Besosa's case is the leading case and has the earliest docket number, the instant case is consolidated with Case No. 19-1673 (FAB). See L.Cv.R. 42. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/5/2019. (EA)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo on behalf of Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC Responses due by 9/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Roig-Lorenzo, Antonio)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. "[I]n order to best serve judicial economy and save litigation costs" and upon a careful review of the parties' motions at Dkt. Nos. #14 and #15 , the Court hereby VACATES the Show Cause Hearing previously scheduled for today. See Vazquez Rivera v. Congar Int'l Corp., 241 F.R.D. 94 (D.P.R. 2007). The Court will explain in detail its determination by separate order. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/3/2019. (EA) Modified on 9/3/2019 edit typo (gav).
September 2, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Continuance of Show Cause Hearing and Additional Relief filed by Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC Re: #14 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Docket 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Punta Lima Development Company, LLC filed by Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC. (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul) Modified on 9/3/2019 edit text (gav).
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Docket 8, MOTION to Consolidate Cases Urgent Motion Requesting Continuance of Show Cause Hearing and for Consolidation of Proceedings with Case 3:19-CV-01673 Before Judge Besosa filed by Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico on behalf of Punta Lima Development Company, LLC Responses due by 9/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Pabon-Rico, Gustavo) Modified on 9/3/2019 lower caps (gav).
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint,,, filed by Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20 to Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit 21 to Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit 22 to Verified Complaint) (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER noted #11 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/27/2019. (EA)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Motion In Compliance with court order under docket no. 8 filed by Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo on behalf of Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC Responses due by 9/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket)(Roig-Lorenzo, Antonio)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC upon Punta Lima Development Company, LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The Show Cause Hearing will be held in Courtroom 4 of the Old San Juan Courthouse. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/27/2019. (EA)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The defendant is ordered to show cause as to the reasons why the Court should not grant Preliminary Injunction in favor of plaintiff. Show Cause Response due by 8/30/2019. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/3/2019 at 1:30 PM in the OLD SAN JUAN COURTROOM before Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. Plaintiff is to notify this Order to the defendant by the end of the day. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/27/2019. (EA)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO; and holding in abeyance #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Upon a careful review of plaintiff's Temporary Restraining Order request, the Court finds that the requirements for granting the same were not met at this stage of the proceedings. Show Cause Hearing will be set in a separate order. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/27/2019. (EA)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/27/2019. (EA)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Punta Lima Development Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Urgent Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, or, in the alternative, a Possessory Injunction filed by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC. Responses due by 9/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul) Modified on 8/26/2019 edit text (gav).
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative, a Possessory Injunction filed by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC Responses due by 9/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against Punta Lima Development Company, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6557587.), filed by Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC. Service due by 11/21/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Civil Cover Sheet, #38 Category Sheet, #39 Summons)(Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC v. Punta Lima Development Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Punta Lima Development Company, LLC
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC
Represented By: Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz
Represented By: Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?