Right Way Environmental Contractors, Inc. v. Agviq, LLC
Defendant: Agviq, LLC
Petitioner: Right Way Environmental Contractors, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01804
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration re 11 Order on Motion for Entry of Default,, Order on Motion Submitting, filed by Hilda L. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Right Way Environmental Contractors, Inc. Responses due by 11/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 AGVIQ Letter Aug. 2, #2 Exhibit 2 RWEC Letter Aug. 14, #3 Exhibit 3 Evidence AGVIQ Deposit, #4 Exhibit 4 RWEC Letter Oct. 2, #5 Exhibit 5-1 AGVIQ Award 240M, #6 Exhibit 5-2 AGVIQ Award 1.9M, #7 Exhibit 5-3 AGVIQ Award 1.7M, #8 Exhibit 5-4 AGVIQ Award 1.4M)(Related document(s) 11 ) (Quinones-Rivera, Hilda)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Entry of Default; noted #8 Motion submitting. In light of this Court's preference of adjudicating cases on the merits, the Motion for Entry of Default is hereby denied. Moreover, the Court grants Defendant an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead. Answer due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/18/2019. (MQ)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Entry of Default Order filed by Agviq, LLC Re: #7 MOTION for Default Entry as to Agviq, LLC filed by Right Way Environmental Contractors, Inc. filed by Agviq, LLC. (Santiago-Camacho, Ineabelle)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ineabelle Santiago-Camacho on behalf of Agviq, LLC (Santiago-Camacho, Ineabelle)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Submitting Evidence of Notice re: #7 MOTION for Default Entry as to Agviq, LLC filed by Right Way Environmental Contractors, Inc. filed by Hilda L. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Right Way Environmental Contractors, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email notice)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Quinones-Rivera, Hilda)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Entry as to Agviq, LLC filed by Hilda L. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Right Way Environmental Contractors, Inc. Responses due by 10/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Incorporation)(Quinones-Rivera, Hilda)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Right Way Environmental Contractors, Inc. upon Agviq, LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Executed) (Quinones-Rivera, Hilda)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Agviq, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: Defective Filing Re: #2 Notice of Defective Filing, MOTION Submitting Civil Summons filed by Hilda L. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Right Way Environmental Contractors, Inc. Responses due by 9/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Quinones-Rivera, Hilda) Modified on 8/29/2019 to edit title (mcm).
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/28/2019. (arg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Agviq, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6559905.), filed by Right Way Environmental Contractors, Inc.. Service due by 11/25/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit 2 - Subcontract Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand for Arbitration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Scheduling Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Arbitration Award 7-12-2019, #6 Exhibit 6 - Arbitration Award 7-14-2019, #7 Exhibit 7 - AGVIQ Letter)(Quinones-Rivera, Hilda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Right Way Environmental Contractors, Inc. v. Agviq, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agviq, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Right Way Environmental Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Hilda L. Quinones-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?