Serrano et al v. Inmediata Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Jessie Serrano and Jozef Mangual-Serrano
Defendant: Inmediata Corp. and Inmediata Health Group Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01811
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Inmediata Corp., Inmediata Health Group Corp. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice at Docket Nos. #8 ; #9 ; #10 . Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/8/2019. (JG)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to allow Robert Dart to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067127) filed by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to allow Justin Marquez to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067127) filed by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to allow Thiago Coelho to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067127) filed by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR as per Counsel's request. Document will be re-filed.*** Motion to allow Thiago Coelho to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067127) filed by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher) Modified on 10/8/2019 (gav).
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Inmediata Corp. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019; Inmediata Health Group Corp. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet (Indiano-Vicic, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Inmediata Corp., Inmediata Health Group Corp. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6562394.), filed by Jessie Serrano, Jozef Mangual-Serrano. Service due by 11/26/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Indiano-Vicic, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serrano et al v. Inmediata Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Serrano
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Robert James Dart
Represented By: Thiago Coelho
Represented By: Justin F. Marquez
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jozef Mangual-Serrano
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Robert James Dart
Represented By: Thiago Coelho
Represented By: Justin F. Marquez
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmediata Corp.
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmediata Health Group Corp.
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?