Municipality of Caguas v. Purdue Pharma Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MUNICIPALITY OF CAGUAS, PUERTO RICO and Municipality of Caguas
Defendant: McKESSON CORPORATION, RICHARD S. SACKLER, ANDA, INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., MALLINCKRODT LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., BEVERLY SACKLER, MALLINCKRODT PLC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. f/k/a WATSON PHARMA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THERESA SACKLER, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ORTHO-McNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAVID A. SACKLER, STUART D. BAKER, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC, CEPHALON, INC., ACTAVIS, LLC, PURDUE PHARMA INC, MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER, MIAMI-LUKEN, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., H.D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, OTHER CORPORATIONS ABC AND 1-100, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., KATHE A. SACKLER, SPECGX LLC, JONATHAN D. SACKLER, NORAMCO, INC., TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE RAYMOND SACKLER FAMILY, ALLERGEN FINANCE, LLC f/k/a ACTAVIS, Inc. f/k/a WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., PAR PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANIES, INC., Allergen Finance, LLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Ilene Sackler-Lefcourt, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceutical L.P. and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01814
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Case transferred from Puerto Rico has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45814, filed 09/25/2019. (ab)
September 19, 2019 Case transferred out to the Northern District of Ohio through the extract civil case utility, sending e-mail to InterdistrictTransfer_OHND@ohnd.uscourts.gov (ab)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CTO-111 received from the Northern District of Ohio. (ab)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Minute Order to involved Clerks entered in MDL #2804 informing of the electronic transfer to the Northern District of Ohio. Order becomes effective upon receipt of a certified copy of CTO-111 from the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel John W. Nichols on 9/19/2019. (ab) Modified on 9/19/2019 to correct cto #(ab).
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-111) for the transfer of this case to N.D. of Ohio. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Tag Along Actions, #2 NEF) (ab)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergen Finance, LLC, Anda, Inc., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, McKESSON CORPORATION, Miami-Luken, Inc., NORAMCO, INC., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceutical L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler-Lefcourt, Specgx LLC, Stuart D. Baker, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal entered by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (Docket 3), this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Judge Daniel R. Dominguez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 08/30/2019. (ft)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned hereby disqualifies himself from presiding over this matter. The case shall randomly be reassigned immediately to another Article III judge. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/30/2019. (EA)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6564927.), filed by Municipality of Caguas, Puerto Rico. Service due by 11/27/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons, #44 Summons, #45 Summons)(Sanders, Douglas) Modified on 9/3/2019 to edit docket text (ab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Municipality of Caguas v. Purdue Pharma Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD S. SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEVERLY SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. f/k/a WATSON PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-McNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID A. SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART D. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIAMI-LUKEN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTHER CORPORATIONS ABC AND 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHE A. SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN D. SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORAMCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE RAYMOND SACKLER FAMILY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGEN FINANCE, LLC f/k/a ACTAVIS, Inc. f/k/a WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergen Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler-Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceutical L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUNICIPALITY OF CAGUAS, PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Municipality of Caguas
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?