Rosado-Santiago v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Yolanda Rosado-Santiago
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01830
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: #7 Motion to Prove Service of Summons is NOTED. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 10/30/2019. (AJT)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Submitting prove service of summons filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Yolanda Rosado-Santiago Responses due by 11/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Supplement mail receipt)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office, Social Security Administration & U.S. Department of Justice (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Yolanda Rosado-Santiago. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Yolanda Rosado-Santiago (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6570937.), filed by Yolanda Rosado-Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosado-Santiago v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Rosado-Santiago
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?