ACM CDGY VI LN, LLC v. Santos-Aldau
Plaintiff: ACM CDGY VI LN, LLC
Defendant: Margie Santos Aldau and Margie Santos-Aldau
Case Number: 3:2019cv01836
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ACM CDGY VI LN, LLC upon Margie Santos-Aldau served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio) Modified on 10/22/2019 to edit docket text (rom).
October 21, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #4 Summons Returned Executed. ***FILED IN ERROR as per Counsels request. Document will be re-filed.*** (mcm)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR as per Counsels request. Document will be re-filed.*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by ACM CDGY VI LN, LLC upon Margie Santos-Aldau served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio) Modified on 10/21/2019 (mcm).
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Margie Santos-Aldau (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Margie Santos-Aldau ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6574015.), filed by ACM CDGY VI LN, LLC. Service due by 12/4/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage Note, #2 Exhibit loan modification agreement, #3 Exhibit Mortgage Note Allonge, #4 Summons, #5 Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio) Modified on 9/6/2019 to edit docket text (rom).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACM CDGY VI LN, LLC v. Santos-Aldau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACM CDGY VI LN, LLC
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margie Santos Aldau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margie Santos-Aldau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?