First Insurance Funding v. Municipality of Anasco
Plaintiff: First Insurance Funding
Defendant: Municipality of Anasco
Case Number: 3:2019cv01838
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Municipality of Anasco. (rom)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Entry of Default. Clerk of Court is to enter default accordingly. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/29/2019. (wm)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Entry as to Municipality of Anasco filed by Clarisa Sola-Gomez on behalf of First Insurance Funding Responses due by 11/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sola-Gomez, Clarisa)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Insurance Funding upon Municipality of Anasco served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Sola-Gomez, Clarisa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis E. Pabon-Roca on behalf of First Insurance Funding (Pabon-Roca, Luis)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Municipality of Anasco (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet, Civil Cover Sheet, and Summons in Civil Action re #1 Complaint filed by First Insurance Funding (Sola-Gomez, Clarisa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Municipality of Anasco ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6576903.), filed by First Insurance Funding. Service due by 12/5/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Agreeement)(Sola-Gomez, Clarisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Insurance Funding v. Municipality of Anasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Insurance Funding
Represented By: Clarisa Sola-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Anasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?