Pabon-Mercado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Edisbel M Pabon-Mercado and Edisbel M. Pabon-Mercado
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01843
Filed: September 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (Docket No. 6), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez for all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment and all post-trial proceedings. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-1843(MEL). Judge Delgado-Colon is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2019. (gr)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Pursuant to Plaintiff's Consent, Docket No. 1 at p. 4, this case is hereby referred to a Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/29/2019.(wm)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office & U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6578932.) re #1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT, filed by Edisbel M Pabon-Mercado, filed by Edisbel M Pabon-Mercado. Related document: #1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT, filed by Edisbel M Pabon-Mercado.(Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1 Commissioner of Social Security, COMPLAINT filed by Edisbel M.Pabon-Mercado re: non-payment of filing fees Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/10/2019. (arg)
September 8, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT for Review of Disability Decision against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Edisbel M Pabon-Mercado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Social Security, #4 Summons Attorney Gen, #5 Summons US Attorney, #6 Appendix No Change Address)(Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pabon-Mercado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edisbel M Pabon-Mercado
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edisbel M. Pabon-Mercado
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?