Dominguez-Rodriguez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rafael Dominguez-Rodriguez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01846
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By #8 Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosa, this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez for all further proceedings and entry of a final judgment. All pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-1846 (MEL). Judge Besosa is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 09/10/2019. (gr)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to a United States magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/10/2019. (brc)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/10/2019. (brc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Rafael Dominguez-Rodriguez. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Rafael Dominguez-Rodriguez (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Rafael Dominguez-Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Rafael Dominguez-Rodriguez. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Rafael Dominguez-Rodriguez Responses due by 9/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez-Rodriguez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Dominguez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?