Estremera-Arroyo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ricardo Estremera-Arroyo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01847
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 6), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez for all further proceedings and entry of a final judgment. All pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-1847 (MEL). Judge Besosa is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 09/16/2019. (gr)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge: GRANTED. This case is referred to a magistrate judge for all further proceedings, to include the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/16/2019. (brc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ricardo Estremera-Arroyo. (De Mier-LeBlanc, Louis)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT. No later than September 17, 2019, plaintiff will inform the Court whether he consents to have a magistrate judge handle all proceedings in this case, to include the entry of judgment. Counsel may use AO Form 83, "Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge." Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/10/2019. (brc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office, Social Security Administration & U.S Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT Ricardo Estremera Arroyo against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6579418.), filed by Ricardo Estremera-Arroyo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney, San Juan, PR, #4 Summons Office of Attorney General of the U.S., #5 Summons SSA, Office of the General Counsel, #6 Summons Commissioner of SS, Baltimore, MD)(De Mier-LeBlanc, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estremera-Arroyo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Estremera-Arroyo
Represented By: Louis A. De Mier-LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?