Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company v. Montes-Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Montes-Arzola, Ruth Nelida Arzola Cortes, Adan Samuel Montes Diaz, Adan Samuel Montes-Diaz and Ruth Nelida Arzola-Cortes
Case Number: 3:2019cv01849
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Summons. The Clerk shall issue the summons by publication accordingly. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/6/2019. (wm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Adan Samuel Montes-Diaz filed by Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit summon ruth, #2 Exhibit summon the conjugal, #3 Exhibit statement under penalty of perjury, #4 Text of Proposed Order orden for service publication, #5 Summons summon by publication)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Adan Samuel Montes Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Montes-Arzola, Ruth Nelida Arzola Cortes (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (ad)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adan Samuel Montes Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Montes-Arzola, Ruth Nelida Arzola Cortes ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6579574.), filed by Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company. Service due by 12/9/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage Note, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company v. Montes-Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Montes-Arzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Nelida Arzola Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adan Samuel Montes Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adan Samuel Montes-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Nelida Arzola-Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?