Gomez-Ferreira v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Eleacer Gomez-Ferreira
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01851
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eleacer Gomez-Ferreira trough USMS upon United States of America served on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (mr)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America through the US Marshals with copy of Order, Copy of Complaint and USM 285 (ad)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Granting #1 "Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis." The Marshals shall serve process upon defendant accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/11/2019. (EMJ)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Eleacer Gomez-Ferreira, Pro Se. Service due by 12/9/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(mcm)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eleacer Gomez-Ferreira, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez-Ferreira v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleacer Gomez-Ferreira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?