Cosinteno v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Cosinteno
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. and ESJ Resort, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01858
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement byESJ Resort, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ESJ Holdings, LLC for ESJ Resort, LLC.. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Joinder Re: #12 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., #13 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of ESJ Resort, LLC Responses due by 11/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #12 , #13 , #11 ) (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto on behalf of Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto on behalf of Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto on behalf of Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Composite))(Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement byHilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto on behalf of Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. (Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Noting #7 "Notice of Related Cases." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/7/2019.(LMR)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Cases by Brandon Cosinteno (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Noting #5 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/4/2019. (ebb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Co-Counsel filed by Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vissepo-Garriga, Jean)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ESJ Resort, LLC, Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Category Sheet by Brandon Cosinteno (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ESJ Resort, LLC, Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6584467.), filed by Brandon Cosinteno. Service due by 12/10/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cosinteno v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESJ Resort, LLC
Represented By: Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Cosinteno
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?