Winnie v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Winnie
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Puerto Rico Caribe Lessee, LLC, Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc. and Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01859
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto on behalf of Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 8, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto on behalf of Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto on behalf of Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Composite))(Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement byHilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #14 Motion to Appear PHV: GRANTED. The Clerk will deposit the admission fee in the Court's non-appropriated funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/08/2019. (brc)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #12 Motion to Appear PHV: GRANTED. The Clerk will deposit the admission fee in the Court's non-appropriated funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/08/2019. (brc)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #11 Motion to Appear PHV: GRANTED. The Clerk will deposit the admission fee in the Court's non-appropriated funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/08/2019. (brc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to allow Brian Marty to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6675562) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Jonathan Winnie Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto on behalf of Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to allow Brandon Bohlman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6675558) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Jonathan Winnie Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to allow John Barton Goplerud to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6675552) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Jonathan Winnie Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Notice (Other): NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/07/2019. (brc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Cases by Jonathan Winnie (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Winnie upon Puerto Rico Caribe Lessee, LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Winnie upon Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc. served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Leave to Appear: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/04/2019. (brc)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Co-Counsel filed by Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vissepo-Garriga, Jean)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Puerto Rico Caribe Lessee, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Category Sheet by Jonathan Winnie (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Puerto Rico Caribe Lessee, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6584472.), filed by Jonathan Winnie. Service due by 12/10/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winnie v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Caribe Lessee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Winnie
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?