DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc v. Sanchez Cruz
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc
Defendant: Lerny Sanchez Cruz
Case Number: 3:2019cv01863
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re Plaintiff's #5 Informative Motion: Noted. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/31/2019. (JG)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Roberto C. Latimer-Valentin on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 11/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc upon Lerny Sanchez Cruz served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lerny Sanchez Cruz (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lerny Sanchez Cruz ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6585519.), filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. Service due by 12/11/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit note and allonge, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons)(Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc v. Sanchez Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lerny Sanchez Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc
Represented By: Roberto C. Latimer-Valentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?