Garcia et al v. Kumho Tire Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Evelyn Santiago-Garriga, Femal, Charlie Garcia, Male, Charlie Garcia and Evelyn Santiago-Garriga
Defendant: Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc., Kumho Tire Co., Inc. and ABC Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01865
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting as requested #7 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/30/2019. (AGF)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time filed by Antonio Gnocchi-Franco on behalf of Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc. Responses due by 11/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gnocchi-Franco, Antonio)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by All Plaintiffs upon Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Suro-Ballester, Jorge)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(gmm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kumho Tire Co., Inc., Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (vdm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel A. Suro-Carrasco on behalf of Charlie Garcia, Male, Evelyn Santiago-Garriga, Femal (Suro-Carrasco, Miguel)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6587935.), filed by Charlie Garcia, Evelyn Santiago-Garriga. Service due by 12/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Appearance of Counsel, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Suro-Ballester, Jorge) Modified on 9/16/2019 to edit docket text (gmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. Kumho Tire Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Santiago-Garriga, Femal
Represented By: Miguel A. Suro-Carrasco
Represented By: Jorge M. Suro-Ballester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Garcia, Male
Represented By: Miguel A. Suro-Carrasco
Represented By: Jorge M. Suro-Ballester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Garcia
Represented By: Miguel A. Suro-Carrasco
Represented By: Jorge M. Suro-Ballester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Santiago-Garriga
Represented By: Miguel A. Suro-Carrasco
Represented By: Jorge M. Suro-Ballester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Antonio Gnocchi-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kumho Tire Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?