Campos v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: CARLOS GABRIEL CAMPOS and Carlos Garbiel Campos
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, USCIS SOUTHEAST REGION, United States Attorney General, United States Attorney for the District of Puerto Rico, USCIS SAN JUAN PR FIELD OFFICE, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Department of Homeland Security (DHS), USCIS South-East Region and Ken Cuccinelli
Case Number: 3:2019cv01869
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Plaintiff's #7 Motion submitting certified English-language translations: Noted. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/25/2019. (JG)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #5 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Carlos Garbiel Campos, 6 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Manuel Porro-Vizcarra on behalf of Carlos Garbiel Campos Responses due by 11/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 21, #4 Exhibit 23, #5 Exhibit 24)(Related document(s) #5 , 6 ) (Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Leave to File Spanish-language documents. English-language translations due by 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/2/2019. (JG)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Manuel Porro-Vizcarra on behalf of Carlos Garbiel Campos Responses due by 10/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Porro-Vizcarra on behalf of Carlos Garbiel Campos (Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ken Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security (DHS), Federal Bureau of Investigations, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, USCIS San Juan PR Field Office, USCIS South-East Region, United States Attorney General, United States Attorney for the District of Puerto Rico (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm) Modified on 9/17/2019 to replace all caps text. (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (vdm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Review De Novo N400 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6588425.), filed by Carlos Gabriel Campos. Service due by 12/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Summons William Barr, #43 Summons USCIS, #44 Summons Rosa Emilia Rodriguez, #45 Summons Linda M. Swacina, #46 Summons Kevin McAleenan, #47 Summons USCIS Ken Cuccinelli, #48 Summons USCIS PR Field Office Deliana Gonzalez, #49 Summons Federal Bureau of Investigations)(Garcia-Miranda, Maria) Modified on 9/17/2019 to replaces all caps text. (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS SOUTHEAST REGION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for the District of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS SAN JUAN PR FIELD OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS South-East Region
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS GABRIEL CAMPOS
Represented By: Maria Del Rosario Garcia-Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Garbiel Campos
Represented By: Maria Del Rosario Garcia-Miranda
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?