Rodriguez et al v. Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jean Pierre Chaparro, Tanairy Rodriguez and Elenis Rodriguez
Defendant: Rosely Roldan-Reyes, Does I-X, XYZ Insurance Companies and Triple-S Propiedad, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01870
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Jean Pierre Chaparro, Elenis Rodriguez, Tanairy Rodriguez filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Plaintiffs.(Laffitte, Miguel) Modified on 11/8/2019 to edit docket text (gmm).
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Does I-X, Rosely Roldan-Reyes, Triple-S Propiedad, Inc., XYZ Insurance Companies, filed by Tanairy Rodriguez, Jean Pierre Chaparro, Elenis Rodriguez.(Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting as requested #11 Motion for Extension of Time until November 6, 2019 to File Answer to Complaint. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/16/2019. (CRH)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Noted #10 Motion for Disclosure Pursuant to Fed. Civ. R. 7.1. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/16/2019. (CRH)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Noted #9 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/16/2019. (CRH)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 6, 2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Elenis Rodriguez, Tanairy Rodriguez, Jean Pierre Chaparro filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Rosely Roldan-Reyes, Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Laffitte, Miguel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Disclosure Pursuant to Fed.Civ.R. 7.1 filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Laffitte, Miguel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Rosely Roldan-Reyes, Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Laffitte, Miguel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Rosely Roldan-Reyes served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019; Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Rosely Roldan-Reyes, Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (vdm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Williams-English on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Williams-English, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicens, Vanesa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6588609.), filed by Tanairy Rodriguez, Jean Pierre Chaparro, Elenis Rodriguez. Service due by 12/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Indiano-Vicic, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez et al v. Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosely Roldan-Reyes
Represented By: Miguel G. Laffitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple-S Propiedad, Inc.
Represented By: Miguel G. Laffitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Pierre Chaparro
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanairy Rodriguez
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elenis Rodriguez
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?